Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 1004 Today
» 1224 Yesterday
» 4816 Week
» 34314 Month
» 371160 Year
» 1592725 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 176 m/e 09/1890
London and North Eastern Railway 8263 m/e 01/1947
British Railways 68263 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7109/1890
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 09/1890
Withdrawal Mon 08/06/1959
Service Life 68 yrs, 9 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1890
WHL West Hartlepool on 01/01/1948
52B Heaton 4w/e 25/09/1954
52A Gateshead 4w/e 08/03/1958
52B Heaton w/e 02/05/1959
   Withdrawn on 08/06/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 11/09/1954
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 16/05/1959
WDN   on 08/06/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1890 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 176
Built at Darlington Works
   
01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 8263    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - West Hartlepool (WHL)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 68263    
25/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
08/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
02/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
08/06/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 68263    

prev prev