Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 323 Today
» 1365 Yesterday
» 4183 Week
» 24625 Month
» 361471 Year
» 1583036 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 103 m/e 09/1890
London and North Eastern Railway 8262 m/e 04/1946
British Railways 68262 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7109/1890
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 09/1890
Withdrawal w/e Mon 25/01/1960
Service Life 69 yrs, 4 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1890
GHD Gateshead on 01/01/1948
54B Tyne Dock 4w/e 16/03/1957
   Withdrawn w/e 25/01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HTN Heaton w/e 09/10/1948
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock 4w/e 23/03/1957
WDN   w/e 25/01/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1948 Darlington Works 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order.
Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year.
No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751.
Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420.
SLS/194808

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1890 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 103
Built at Darlington Works
   
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8262    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 68262    
16/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B)    
25/01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 68262    

prev prev