Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 346 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 1595 Week
» 22037 Month
» 358883 Year
» 1580448 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 239 m/e 05/1890
London and North Eastern Railway 8253 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 68253 m/e 08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7105/1890
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 05/1890
Withdrawal Mon 16/09/1957
Service Life 67 yrs, 4 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1890
YK York (North) on 01/01/1948
55E   4w/e 15/12/1956
   Withdrawn on 16/09/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 20D Normanton 4w/e 29/12/1956
LOAN 20D Normanton 4w/e 29/12/1956
EXLOAN 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 26/01/1957
WDN   on 16/09/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1890 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 239
Built at Darlington Works
   
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8253    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - York (North) (YK)    
08/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 68253    
15/12/1956 Allocation      
16/09/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 68253    

prev prev