Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 751 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7140 Week
» 27582 Month
» 364428 Year
» 1585993 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 501 m/e 09/1889
London and North Eastern Railway 8251 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 68251 m/e 11/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7109/1889
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 09/1889
Withdrawal Mon 12/01/1959
Service Life 69 yrs, 4 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1889
GHD Gateshead on 01/01/1948
52B Heaton 4w/e 19/12/1953
53A Hull Dairycoates 5w/e 20/04/1957
53B Hull Botanic Gardens 5w/e 20/07/1957
53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 19/10/1957
   Withdrawn on 12/01/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MAR March m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 53B Hull Botanic Gardens 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 05/10/1957
WDN   on 12/01/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1951 Locomotives still not renumbered Although it is well over three years since the B.R. renumbering scheme was introduced, there were several classes with a small percentage still not renumbered (or at any rate not advised as done) at the end of June-Class B16 (69 survivors): Nos. 1419/23/33. Class D20 (28 survivors): Nos. 2360/72/95. Class Q5 (4 survivors): Nos. 3270, 3311/4/26. Of this large class, only 9 received B.R. numbers, the last to be done being 63313(2/12/48). None of the renumbered engines survives. Class Q6 is completely renumbered, No. 63342 having just been done. Class Q7 (15 engines): all done except. No. 3460. Class J21 (37 survivors): all done except 5025, 5117/22. Class J24 (6 survivors): not renumbered are 5623 (Scotland) and 5644. Class J25 (57 survivors): all done except 5663/7/86, 5727. (5699 has become 65699 but no trace of advice). Class J26 was completed on 19/5/51 when 65769 was done. Class J27 (115 engines): all done except 5890/4. Class G5 (106 survivors): all renumbered by 31/3/51. Class J71 (76 survivors): twelve to be done, Nos. 8230/1/9/47/9/51/4/72/98, 8304/11/6-an unusually large percentage not dealt with. Class J77 (38 survivors): Nos. 8405/38 not renumbered. Class J72 (113 engines): to be renumbered 8672/81, 8730(?), 8748. Class N10 (19 survivors): all done (?except 9095). SLS/195108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1889 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 501
Built at Darlington Works
   
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8251    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD)    
11/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 68251    
19/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B)    
19/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
12/01/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 68251    

prev prev