Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 350 Today
» 1365 Yesterday
» 4210 Week
» 24652 Month
» 361498 Year
» 1583063 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 224 m/e 08/1889
London and North Eastern Railway 8248 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 68248 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7108/1889
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 08/1889
Withdrawal Tue 03/07/1951
Service Life 61 yrs, 11 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1889
WHL West Hartlepool on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 03/07/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 03/07/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/02/1948 Darlington Works New 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 9010. No. 9001 has returned to N.Rd with a damaged buffer beam. Nos. 9002-9006 are still working from Darlington and Nos. 9007-9010 have not yet been handed over to the shed. Nos. 9004/5 are Darlington 2023/4 of 1948, both bearing a January paint date. Locomotives for shops during February included Nos. 510, 804, 822, 2933, 2937, 2993, 3279, 3298, 3375, 3420, 4756, 5063, 5612, 5691, 5878, 7266, 7604, 7608, 8235, 8248, 8250, 8273, 8277, 8427, 8730, 9419, 9834, 9838 an 9875. Of these Nos. 3279, 5063 and 9419 are in the scrap yard, No. 9419 being cut up at the end of February. Locomotives ex shops during February included Nos. 937, 1069, 2354, 2382, 2386, 2982, 3260, 3370, 3373, 3374, 5645, 5646, 5663, 5716, 5769, 5805, 7243, 7334, 8230, 8272, 8310, 8402, 8433, 8727, 8729, 8748, 9097, 9118, 9376 an 9780. 'B.1' No. 1069 is painted green and lettered 'British Railways' as No. 1289 (NBL 26190/47) SLS/194804
30/04/1948 Darlington Works 'L.1's' Nos. 9000-9015 are to be renumbered 67701-67716. No. 67717 (9016) is the first to come out under this number, while No. 9015 was altered to 67716. The paint dates of Nos. 9009-9012 are March, and Nos. 9013-9015 and 67717-67718 are April. The Works' Nos. are 2028-2036/48 respectively. The next order for North Road will be a batch of 'A.1' 'Pacifics.' The rumour of further 'B.1's' came about owing to Stooperdale building a batch of spare boilers for this class. Locomotives for shops or scrap during the period April 4th-May 2nd included:-Nos. 1440, E1461, 2391, 2747, 3037, 3170, 3286, 3315, 5069, 5625, 5768/88, 7306, 7649/88, 9837/52, 9917/33, 77414, 79198. The following locomotives have arrived for cutting-up:-ex G.E. Nos. 5380/83, 5400, 7120/37, 8212, ex MET Nos. 7511/12 and ex M.G.N. No. 8485. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 5778, 9856, 60510, 60825, 61011/60/71, 61420, 62388, 63125/40, 65624/50, 65825/47/51, 67263, 67301, 67632/84, 67718, 68248/90, 68724, 69786, 69875, 69910. The following locomotives have been painted or repainted green: Nos. 61011/60/71 an 67684. No. 60510 came off Works without nameplates, but returned and has at last had these fitted-Robert the Bruce. SLS/194806

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1889 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 224
Built at Darlington Works
   
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8248    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - West Hartlepool (WHL)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 68248    
03/07/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 68248    

prev prev