Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 782 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7171 Week
» 27613 Month
» 364459 Year
» 1586024 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1167 m/e 07/1889
London and North Eastern Railway 8246 on 17/02/1946
British Railways 68246 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7107/1889
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 07/1889
Withdrawal Mon 24/11/1958
Service Life 69 yrs, 4 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1889
YK York (North) on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 24/11/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 24/11/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/09/1948 Easingwold Railway This line now uses a York 'J.71' for a month at a time, No. 8246 was used during August and No. 8297 in September; their own 0-6-OST being still derelict at North Road Works. SLS/194811

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1889 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1167
Built at Darlington Works
   
17/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8246    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - York (North) (YK)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 68246    
24/11/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 68246    

prev prev