Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1223 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7613 Week
» 37111 Month
» 373957 Year
» 1595522 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 286 m/e 05/1888
London and North Eastern Railway 8242 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 68242 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7105/1888
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 05/1888
Withdrawal Mon 04/08/1958
Service Life 70 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1888
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 01/01/1948
51E Stockton 5w/e 23/04/1955
51F West Auckland 5w/e 23/07/1955
   Withdrawn on 04/08/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51E Stockton 4w/e 23/04/1955
ALLOC 51F West Auckland 4w/e 16/07/1955
WDN   on 04/08/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1954 York MPD During this period the South shed was temporarily reopened while repairs were being effected to the turntable in No. 4 roundhouse at the North shed. New Standard Class 3 2-6-0's from Swindon 77002 and 77003 called at York on 17/3/54 and 19/3/54 respectively en route for Darlington. The following Ll 2-6-4T's called at York en route from the south to Darlington Works for repair: 67792 (34E)-19/3/54, 67718 (34E)-29/3/54, 67756-9/4/54. On this latter date 67753 (34B) passed through York resplendent ex-Darlington Works, and likewise 67764 (53B) and 67795 (34E) on 20/4/54. J71 68296 (53A) and 68242 (53A) passed through York ex-Darlington Works on 19/3/54 and 12/4/54 respectively en route for Hull. On 9/4/54 J71 68238 (20D) was at York with rods 'down' while proceeding from Normanton to Darlington Works, and similarly 69104 (53A) from Hull to Darlington on 20/4/54. Another unusual visitor was 60509 (64B) en route from the Scottish Region to Doncaster Works on 28/4/54. 90439 (35A) was under repair at York shed on 29/3/54. SLS/195406

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1888 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 286
Built at Darlington Works
   
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8242    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 68242    
23/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (51E)    
23/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to West Auckland (51F)    
04/08/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 68242    

prev prev