Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 318 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18121 Week
» 71137 Month
» 190664 Year
» 3217517 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
347 |
m/e |
05/1887 |
London and North Eastern Railway |
8238 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
68238 |
m/e |
06/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J71 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
During 05/1887 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 10/09/1955 |
Service Life |
68 yrs, 4 mths , 11 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1887 |
YK |
|
York (North) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
20D |
|
Normanton |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
20D |
|
Normanton |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
10/09/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
20D |
Normanton |
w/e |
29/12/1951 |
ALLOC |
20D |
Normanton |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
ALLOC |
20D |
Normanton |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
10/09/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/04/1954 |
York MPD |
During this period the South shed was temporarily reopened while repairs were being effected to the turntable in No. 4 roundhouse at the North shed. New Standard Class 3 2-6-0's from Swindon 77002 and 77003 called at York on 17/3/54 and 19/3/54 respectively en route for Darlington. The following Ll 2-6-4T's called at York en route from the south to Darlington Works for repair: 67792 (34E)-19/3/54, 67718 (34E)-29/3/54, 67756-9/4/54. On this latter date 67753 (34B) passed through York resplendent ex-Darlington Works, and likewise 67764 (53B) and 67795 (34E) on 20/4/54. J71 68296 (53A) and 68242 (53A) passed through York ex-Darlington Works on 19/3/54 and 12/4/54 respectively en route for Hull. On 9/4/54 J71 68238 (20D) was at York with rods 'down' while proceeding from Normanton to Darlington Works, and similarly 69104 (53A) from Hull to Darlington on 20/4/54. Another unusual visitor was 60509 (64B) en route from the Scottish Region to Doncaster Works on 28/4/54. 90439 (35A) was under repair at York shed on 29/3/54. |
SLS/195406 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1887 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 347 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8238 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - York (North) (YK) |
|
|
06/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68238 |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Normanton (20D) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Normanton (20D) |
|
|
10/09/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68238 |
|
|