Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 1099 Today
» 1224 Yesterday
» 4911 Week
» 34409 Month
» 371255 Year
» 1592820 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 533 m/e 02/1887
London and North Eastern Railway 8234 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 68234 m/e 10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7102/1887
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 02/1887
Withdrawal Sat 21/08/1954
Service Life 67 yrs, 6 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1887
GHD Gateshead on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 21/08/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HTN Heaton w/e 02/10/1948
WDN   on 02/08/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
20/08/1954 Darlington Works The 2MT engines are completed up to No, 78029 and the first two Diesel shunters on order are ready for traffic. D20 No. 2352 has arrived at Works marked ? She is in good condition externally. The diesels from North Road are out up to No. 13131 and A7 No. 69787, J71 68234 are in the scrap yard. SLS/195410

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1887 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 533
Built at Darlington Works
   
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8234    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD)    
10/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 68234    
21/08/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 68234    

prev prev