Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3708 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17114 Week
» 70130 Month
» 189657 Year
» 3216510 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
131 |
m/e |
06/1914 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7131 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8223 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
68223 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J70 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
P75 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 06/1914 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 19/07/1955 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 1 mth , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1955 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
09/08/1952 |
ALLOC |
32D |
Yarmouth South Town |
4w/e |
26/12/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
19/07/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1914 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 131 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7131 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8223 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Lynn (KL) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68223 |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
23/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
19/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) |
|
|
19/07/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68223 |
|
|
08/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|