Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2940 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16346 Week
» 69362 Month
» 188889 Year
» 3215742 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
127 |
m/e |
06/1914 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7127 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8221 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
68221 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J70 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
P75 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 06/1914 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 21/05/1951 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 11 mths , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1951 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
COL |
Colchester |
w/e |
06/03/1948 |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
w/e |
22/05/1948 |
ALLOC |
IPS |
Ipswich |
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
21/05/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1914 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 127 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7127 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8221 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
06/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (COL) |
|
|
22/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68221 |
|
|
09/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
05/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
21/05/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68221 |
|
|