Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3738 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17144 Week
» 70160 Month
» 189687 Year
» 3216540 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
30 |
m/e |
02/1914 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7030 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8656 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
68656 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
J68 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
G75 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 02/1914 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 04/04/1960 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 2 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
32D |
Yarmouth South Town |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
ALLOC |
32C |
Lowestoft |
4w/e |
31/10/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
04/04/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1935 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1914 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 30 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7030 |
|
|
04/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8656 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Lynn (KL) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68656 |
|
|
22/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) |
|
|
31/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
04/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
04/04/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68656 |
|
|