Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 27 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17830 Week
» 70846 Month
» 190373 Year
» 3217226 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
23 |
m/e |
12/1913 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7023 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8649 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
68649 |
m/e |
06/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
J68 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
G75 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1913 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 10/09/1961 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 9 mths , 11 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/09/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1924 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1913 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 23 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7023 |
|
|
02/1924 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8649 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
06/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68649 |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
17/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
10/09/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68649 |
|
|
10/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|