Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1517 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19320 Week
» 72336 Month
» 191863 Year
» 3218716 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
204 |
m/e |
12/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7204 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8592 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
68592 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
G47 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 28/07/1955 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 7 mths , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1955 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 204 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7204 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8592 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68592 |
|
|
19/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) |
|
|
22/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
28/07/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68592 |
|
|