Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 728 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14134 Week
» 67150 Month
» 186677 Year
» 3213530 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
415 |
m/e |
01/1891 |
Great Eastern Railway (2nd) |
19 |
m/e |
01/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7019 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8523 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
68523 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
B26 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 01/1891 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 05/12/1955 |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 11 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1956 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1891 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 415 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
01/1920 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 19 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7019 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8523 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68523 |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) |
|
|
25/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) |
|
|
22/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
19/09/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
05/12/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68523 |
|
|
1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|