Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 301 Today
» 5648 Yesterday
» 17164 Week
» 8220 Month
» 354644 Year
» 3381497 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1060 |
m/e |
07/1896 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4060 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8797 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
68797 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
5031 |
To Service |
During 07/1896 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 03/11/1955 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 4 mths , 4 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1896 |
KX |
|
Kings Cross |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
35C |
|
Spital Bridge |
4w/e |
14/02/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
03/11/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
03/11/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1060 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 5031 |
|
|
08/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4060 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8797 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68797 |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) |
|
|
03/11/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68797 |
|
|