Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 3465 Today
» 2271 Yesterday
» 14680 Week
» 5736 Month
» 352160 Year
» 3379013 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1056 |
m/e |
07/1896 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4056 |
m/e |
06/1927 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8793 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
68793 |
m/e |
11/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
5027 |
To Service |
During 07/1896 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 21/05/1956 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 10 mths , 21 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
36C |
Frodingham |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
11/07/1953 |
ALLOC |
35A |
New England |
4w/e |
05/09/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
21/05/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1056 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 5027 |
|
|
06/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4056 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8793 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY) |
|
|
11/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68793 |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
25/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
22/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) |
|
|
19/09/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
21/05/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68793 |
|
|