Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2013 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19816 Week
» 72832 Month
» 192359 Year
» 3219212 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1048 |
m/e |
07/1896 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4048 |
m/e |
05/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8785 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
68785 |
m/e |
07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
5019 |
To Service |
During 07/1896 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 06/01/1958 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 6 mths , 7 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
06/01/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1946 |
General |
Two G.N. visitors, 'J.52' 4048 and 4231, make a change by occasional visits to Liverpool Street. where 'Super-Clauds' are getting rarer than ever, Cambridge and Clacton turns most often producing them. It is good to see the 'B.12' bearing their original G.E. numbers again. Electrification will no doubt cut deeply into the G.E. veterans |
SLS/194701 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1048 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 5019 |
|
|
05/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4048 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8785 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68785 |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
18/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
12/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
06/01/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68785 |
|
|