Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 131 Today
» 5648 Yesterday
» 16994 Week
» 8050 Month
» 354474 Year
» 3381327 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
976 |
m/e |
12/1894 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3976 |
m/e |
09/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8778 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
68778 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
662 |
To Service |
During 12/1894 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 03/07/1957 |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 7 mths , 3 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1894 |
HSY |
|
Hornsey |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
36A |
|
Doncaster |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
36A |
|
Doncaster |
4w/e |
18/10/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
03/07/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
03/07/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1894 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 976 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 662 |
|
|
09/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3976 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8778 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68778 |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
18/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
03/07/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68778 |
|
|