Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 290 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18093 Week
» 71109 Month
» 190636 Year
» 3217489 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
969 |
m/e |
02/1894 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3969 |
m/e |
12/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8771 |
on |
23/03/1946 |
British Railways |
68771 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
643 |
To Service |
During 02/1894 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 10/10/1955 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 8 mths , 9 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1894 |
KX |
|
Kings Cross |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
35A |
|
New England |
4w/e |
19/09/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
10/10/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
35A |
New England |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/10/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1894 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 969 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 643 |
|
|
12/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3969 |
|
|
23/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8771 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68771 |
|
|
19/09/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
10/10/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68771 |
|
|