Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1026 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18829 Week
» 71845 Month
» 191372 Year
» 3218225 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
963 |
m/e |
08/1893 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3963 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8766 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
68766 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
623 |
To Service |
During 08/1893 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 23/01/1952 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 5 mths , 23 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1893 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 963 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 623 |
|
|
10/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3963 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8766 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68766 |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
31/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
23/01/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68766 |
|
|