Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 4328 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17734 Week
» 70750 Month
» 190277 Year
» 3217130 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
925 |
m/e |
03/1893 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3925 |
m/e |
01/1927 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8759 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
68759 |
m/e |
05/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
603 |
To Service |
During 03/1893 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 19/07/1956 |
Service Life |
63 yrs, 4 mths , 20 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
ALLOC |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
ALLOC |
35A |
New England |
4w/e |
29/01/1955 |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
19/07/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1893 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 925 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 603 |
|
|
01/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3925 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8759 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY) |
|
|
05/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68759 |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
18/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) |
|
|
22/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
22/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
19/07/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68759 |
|
|