Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 19 Today
» 5648 Yesterday
» 16882 Week
» 7938 Month
» 354362 Year
» 3381215 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
922 |
m/e |
12/1892 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3922 |
m/e |
04/1927 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8757 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
68757 |
w/e |
25/11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
597 |
To Service |
During 12/1892 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 29/11/1954 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 11 mths , 30 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1892 |
HSY |
|
Hornsey |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
34A |
|
Kings Cross |
w/e |
24/11/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
29/11/1954 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
34A |
Kings Cross |
w/e |
24/11/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
29/11/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1954 |
Unusual withdrawals |
At the end of November two engines of more than usual interest appeared among the withdrawals. No. 62782, built at Stratford in 1892 as No. 466, was one of the Holden G.E. 'Intermediates,' a class which originally totalled 100 engines. Fifty were withdrawn by the end of 1931, thirty more between 1933 and 1938, No. 7502 in 1939 and No. 7485 in 1940, leaving 18 in service, which figure has been unchanged until now. The other withdrawal of note is No. 68757, the oldest surviving. Stirling saddletank, built at Doncaster in 1892, as No. 922; Nos. 921-930 were the last ones built with 17½' cylinders, three of which still remain on the register. |
SLS/195501 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1892 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 922 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 597 |
|
|
04/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3922 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8757 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY) |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68757 |
|
|
24/11/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
29/11/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68757 |
|
|