Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 345 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18148 Week
» 71164 Month
» 190691 Year
» 3217544 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1286 |
m/e |
02/1909 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4286 |
m/e |
01/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8885 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
68885 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
257 |
Works Number |
1221 |
To Service |
During 02/1909 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 18/09/1956 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 7 mths , 18 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1909 |
DON |
|
Doncaster |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
34C |
|
Hatfield |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
34A |
|
Kings Cross |
4w/e |
19/02/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
18/09/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
34C |
Hatfield |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
ALLOC |
34A |
Kings Cross |
4w/e |
26/02/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
18/09/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1909 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1286 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1221 |
|
|
01/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4286 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8885 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68885 |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
19/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
18/09/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68885 |
|
|