Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1915 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15321 Week
» 68337 Month
» 187864 Year
» 3214717 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1284 |
m/e |
12/1908 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4284 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8883 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
68883 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
257 |
Works Number |
1219 |
To Service |
During 12/1908 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 26/09/1955 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 9 mths , 27 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
38B |
Annesley |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
34B |
Hornsey |
4w/e |
29/11/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
26/09/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1284 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1219 |
|
|
10/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4284 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8883 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68883 |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (38B) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (38B) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
13/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
26/09/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68883 |
|
|