Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 408 Today
» 5648 Yesterday
» 17271 Week
» 8327 Month
» 354751 Year
» 3381604 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1261 |
m/e |
01/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4261 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8860 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
68860 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
227 |
Works Number |
954 |
To Service |
During 01/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 23/12/1957 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 11 mths , 22 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1902 |
DON |
|
Doncaster |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
38A |
|
Colwick |
3w/e |
12/11/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
23/12/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/12/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1261 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 954 |
|
|
03/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4261 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8860 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68860 |
|
|
12/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
23/12/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68860 |
|
|