Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 244 Today
» 5648 Yesterday
» 17107 Week
» 8163 Month
» 354587 Year
» 3381440 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1258 |
m/e |
12/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4258 |
m/e |
05/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8857 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
68857 |
w/e |
30/12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
227 |
Works Number |
951 |
To Service |
During 12/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 14/04/1958 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 4 mths , 15 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1901 |
DON |
|
Doncaster |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
37A |
|
Ardsley |
4w/e |
29/11/1952 |
37A |
|
Ardsley |
4w/e |
13/12/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
14/04/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
37A |
Ardsley |
4w/e |
29/11/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/04/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1258 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 951 |
|
|
05/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4258 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8857 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
30/12/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68857 |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) |
|
|
13/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) |
|
|
14/04/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68857 |
|
|