Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 379 Today
» 5648 Yesterday
» 17242 Week
» 8298 Month
» 354722 Year
» 3381575 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1248 |
m/e |
05/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4248 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8847 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
68847 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4493 |
To Service |
During 05/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 01/08/1958 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 3 mths , 2 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1899 |
DON |
|
Doncaster |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
36B |
|
Mexborough |
3w/e |
12/11/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
01/08/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
36B |
Mexborough |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
01/08/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1248 Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 4493 |
|
|
03/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4248 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8847 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68847 |
|
|
12/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) |
|
|
01/08/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68847 |
|
|