Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3949 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17355 Week
» 70371 Month
» 189898 Year
» 3216751 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1229 |
m/e |
04/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4229 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8828 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
68828 |
w/e |
30/12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4474 |
To Service |
During 04/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 03/02/1958 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 10 mths , 3 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
35A |
New England |
3w/e |
28/07/1951 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
03/02/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1229 Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 4474 |
|
|
03/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4229 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8828 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
30/12/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68828 |
|
|
28/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
18/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
08/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
03/02/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68828 |
|
|