Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 117 Today
» 5648 Yesterday
» 16980 Week
» 8036 Month
» 354460 Year
» 3381313 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1220 |
m/e |
02/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4220 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8819 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
68819 |
w/e |
18/11/1950 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
34D |
Hitchin (GNR) |
4w/e |
18/09/1954 |
ALLOC |
35A |
New England |
4w/e |
26/02/1955 |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
18/06/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1220 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 2925 |
|
|
12/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4220 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8819 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE) |
|
|
18/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68819 |
|
|
23/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D) |
|
|
19/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
22/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
18/06/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68819 |
|
|