Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 5266 Today
» 2271 Yesterday
» 16481 Week
» 7537 Month
» 353961 Year
» 3380814 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1218 |
m/e |
02/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4218 |
m/e |
11/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8817 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
68817 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1218 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 2923 |
|
|
11/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4218 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8817 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68817 |
|
|
18/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) |
|
|
22/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
12/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
25/05/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
04/04/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68817 |
|
|