Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 204 Today
» 5648 Yesterday
» 17067 Week
» 8123 Month
» 354547 Year
» 3381400 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1204 |
m/e |
09/1897 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4204 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8808 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
68808 |
m/e |
12/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
203 |
Works Number |
738 |
To Service |
During 09/1897 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 12/04/1957 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 7 mths , 12 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
37A |
Ardsley |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
34B |
Hornsey |
4w/e |
29/11/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
12/04/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1897 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1204 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 738 |
|
|
12/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4204 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8808 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY) |
|
|
12/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68808 |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
13/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
12/04/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68808 |
|
|