Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 702 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14108 Week
» 67124 Month
» 186651 Year
» 3213504 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
1063 |
m/e |
12/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8963 |
on |
21/01/1946 |
British Railways |
68963 |
m/e |
07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J50 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
308 |
Works Number |
1660 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1926 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 13/02/1962 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 2 mths , 14 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
40B |
Immingham |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
18/08/1956 |
ALLOC |
36C |
Frodingham |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
16/05/1959 |
LOAN |
91NE |
|
4w/e |
05/08/1961 |
LOAN |
56B |
Ardsley |
5w/e |
12/08/1961 |
ALLOC |
56B |
Ardsley |
4w/e |
09/09/1961 |
ALLOC |
56F |
Low Moor |
5w/e |
03/02/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
13/02/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1063 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1660 |
|
|
21/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8963 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68963 |
|
|
18/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
25/08/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
19/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
09/05/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
05/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) |
|
|
19/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) |
|
|
13/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) |
|
|
13/02/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68963 |
|
|