Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1686 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15092 Week
» 68108 Month
» 187635 Year
» 3214488 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
213 |
m/e |
07/1919 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3213 |
m/e |
05/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8912 |
on |
20/01/1946 |
British Railways |
68912 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J50 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
289 |
Works Number |
1494 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 07/1919 to Ardsley (ARD) |
Withdrawal |
Mon 14/09/1959 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 2 mths , 15 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
56F |
Low Moor |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
ALLOC |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
4w/e |
22/02/1958 |
ALLOC |
53E |
Goole |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
ALLOC |
56F |
Low Moor |
4w/e |
21/02/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/09/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1919 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 213 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1494 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|
05/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3213 |
|
|
20/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8912 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68912 |
|
|
08/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) |
|
|
08/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (53E) |
|
|
31/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) |
|
|
14/09/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68912 |
|
|