Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4289 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17695 Week
» 70711 Month
» 190238 Year
» 3217091 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
164 |
m/e |
03/1914 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3164 |
m/e |
01/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1945) |
3187 |
m/e |
06/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8897 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
68897 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
56F |
Low Moor |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
ALLOC |
51A |
Darlington |
4w/e |
22/02/1958 |
ALLOC |
56A |
Wakefield |
4w/e |
11/07/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/11/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1914 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 164 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1424 Allocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) |
|
|
01/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3164 |
|
|
06/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3187 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8897 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68897 |
|
|
08/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) |
|
|
08/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
05/11/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68897 |
|
|