|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 10/09/1942 | 12/09/1942 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/06/1943 | 23/07/1943 | 25 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/06/1946 | 06/07/1946 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 27485 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4982 |
||
Gateshead Works | 23/11/1947 | 16/12/1947 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/03/1949 | 14/05/1949 | 65 days | General | Renumbered to BR 64982 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 01/07/1952 | 18/07/1952 | 18 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/08/1955 | 10/09/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 27587 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 19/12/1956 | 18/01/1957 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/01/1959 | 13/02/1959 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 27539 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/07/1962 | Darlington MPD (Awaiting Works) | Stored: 43070 (51L), 43101 (51L), 65768, 65772, 65773, 69002 (51A), 78015 (51J). Ex Works: 43014 (50A), 43125 (50B), 60834 (62B), 60944 (52B), 60973 (63A), 62004 (51A), 63389 (51L), 68043 (51A), 90011 (51A), 90273 (51L), 90430 (51A), 92098 (52H). Awaiting Works: 42639 (50F), 43134 (66D), 46494 (31A), 60818 (64A), 64706 (52G), 64713, 64730 (51L), 64757 (51L), 64758 (51L), 64821 (51L), 64835 (51F), 64848 (51F), 64982 (51F), 65670, 65761, 65776. Visitors : D12 (55H), 42553 (50A), 60040 (52A). | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
21/05/1941 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3092 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1860 Allocated to St Margarets (STM) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
10/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/09/1942. Dep: 12/09/1942. | ||
29/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1943. Dep: 23/07/1943. | ||
03/05/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
17/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1946. Dep: 06/07/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27485 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4982 |
||
23/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/11/1947. Dep: 16/12/1947. | ||
29/08/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
04/09/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
11/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1949. Dep: 14/05/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64982 |
||
23/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
29/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
19/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
01/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 01/07/1952. Dep: 18/07/1952. | ||
31/08/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
06/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
12/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1955. Dep: 10/09/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27587 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/12/1956. Dep: 18/01/1957. | ||
16/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1959. Dep: 13/02/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27539 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64982 from West Auckland (51F) | ||
01/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |