|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 02/08/1943 | 18/09/1943 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 27546 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 18/09/1945 | 12/10/1945 | 25 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 31/10/1945 | 24/11/1945 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 27/11/1945 | 08/12/1945 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/03/1946 | 09/03/1946 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/09/1948 | 17/09/1948 | 14 days | General | Boiler number 27553 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64975 |
||
Inverurie Works | 05/12/1951 | 28/12/1951 | 24 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/06/1954 | 08/08/1954 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 27556 (Diagram 97) |
||
Inverurie Works | 19/07/1955 | 26/08/1955 | 39 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/11/1955 | 03/12/1955 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/04/1959 | 24/04/1959 | 21 days | General | Boiler number 25805 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 06/11/1959 | 25/11/1959 | 20 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1949 | Vickers Armstrong Works | Class '8' W.D. 2-8-0's awaiting repair at Vickers-Armstrong's Works during February were:-Nos. 3085, 63141, 77111/52, 77218, 77378, 77401, 79219; while those ex Works during the same period were:-Nos. 70817, 77001, 77115, 77221, 77310, 78542, 79264, 90685 (ex 79224). | SLS/194904 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
17/03/1941 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3085 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1853 Allocated to St Margarets (STM) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
02/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1943. Dep: 18/09/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27546 (Diagram 97) |
||
20/08/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) | ||
18/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1945. Dep: 12/10/1945. | ||
31/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/10/1945. Dep: 24/11/1945. | ||
27/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/11/1945. Dep: 08/12/1945. | ||
02/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/03/1946. Dep: 09/03/1946. | ||
22/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4975 | ||
16/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) | ||
04/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1948. Dep: 17/09/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27553 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64975 |
||
05/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 05/12/1951. Dep: 28/12/1951. | ||
15/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1954. Dep: 08/08/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27556 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/07/1955. Dep: 26/08/1955. | ||
12/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/11/1955. Dep: 03/12/1955. | ||
13/03/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
04/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1959. Dep: 24/04/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 25805 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/11/1959. Dep: 25/11/1959. | ||
29/08/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64975 from Dawsholm (65D) | ||
11/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |