|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 23/01/1944 | 22/04/1944 | 91 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 04/09/1946 | 25/01/1947 | 144 days | General | Boiler number BP134 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/01/1950 | 18/03/1950 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 27721 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/03/1950 | 23/03/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 11/08/1952 | 03/10/1952 | 54 days | Intermediate | |||
Stratford Works | 21/02/1955 | 02/04/1955 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 27432 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/02/1941 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3083 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1851 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
30/03/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
23/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1944. Dep: 22/04/1944. | ||
16/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4973 | ||
04/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1946. Dep: 25/01/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number BP134 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/01/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 64973 | ||
25/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1950. Dep: 18/03/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27721 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/03/1950. Dep: 23/03/1950. | ||
11/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 11/08/1952. Dep: 03/10/1952. | ||
17/10/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
21/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1955. Dep: 02/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27432 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/11/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64973 from Stratford (30A) | ||
12/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |