|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 02/12/1940 | 04/01/1941 | 34 days | General | Boiler number E1351 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/01/1941 | 20/01/1941 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 17/06/1943 | 20/07/1943 | 34 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/12/1943 | 18/12/1943 | 17 days | Heavy | Boiler number 4907 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/10/1945 | 12/01/1946 | 101 days | General | Boiler number 2097 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/08/1948 | 25/09/1948 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 27697 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64970 |
||
Gorton Works | 25/01/1950 | 04/03/1950 | 39 days | Light Casual | |||
Derby Works | 16/03/1952 | 22/04/1952 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Stratford Works | 20/06/1954 | 14/08/1954 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 27687 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/04/1957 | 25/05/1957 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 27884 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/05/1961 | Doncaster Works (Scrap Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2392-4, D3489, E3062-7. Boiler Shop: E3068-70. Stripping Road: D2402, 60007/73, 60119/61, 61327, 61844/93, 61904/85/97, 62059, 63967, 70023. Scrap Road: 63947/58, 64970, 68916/29, 69561 all intact, with 63952 just cut up. Crimpsall: 70027, 73016. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60065. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D3129/52, D3445, D5534/71, 12124, 13252, 13325, 43088, 43152/5, 60013/24/33/88/99, 60525, 61095, 61190, 61249, 61300/70, 61832, 62051, 63963, 70001/5/35. Outside Erecting Shops: 60017, 61845. Outside Weigh House: 43091, 60137, 62047. Paint Shop: D2390/1, D5698, D6715, D8215, D9004/5, E3056/61, 60038/9, 61122/88, 63938, 76031. Outside Paint Shop: D345/6. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/08/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1997 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1769 Allocated to Ipswich (IPS) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
10/05/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
02/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1940. Dep: 04/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number E1351 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/01/1941. Dep: 20/01/1941. | ||
30/04/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
17/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1943. Dep: 20/07/1943. | ||
02/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 02/12/1943. Dep: 18/12/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4907 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/08/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
04/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1945. Dep: 12/01/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2097 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
03/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4970 | ||
15/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1948. Dep: 25/09/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27697 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64970 |
||
25/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/01/1950. Dep: 04/03/1950. | ||
16/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/03/1952. Dep: 22/04/1952. | ||
20/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1954. Dep: 14/08/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27687 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1957. Dep: 25/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27884 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/05/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64970 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
06/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped |