|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 08/04/1940 | 11/05/1940 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 4906 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/12/1942 | 20/03/1943 | 99 days | General | Boiler number 4915 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/08/1944 | 14/10/1944 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 3195 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/11/1946 | 08/02/1947 | 96 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4969 |
||
Derby Works | 11/06/1950 | 20/09/1950 | 102 days | General | Boiler number E1356 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64969 |
||
Gorton Works | 02/05/1953 | 13/06/1953 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 27762 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/06/1953 | 08/07/1953 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 16/05/1956 | 23/06/1956 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27729 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/06/1959 | 30/07/1959 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 27799 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/08/1959 | 26/08/1959 | 9 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1946 | General | At this date (30/11/1946) only the following Scottish Area engines still require to be renumbered: 4488, 4491, 2745, 4819, 4891, 4898, 3658, 3682, 3692, 1996, 9765, 6897, 3057, 9499, 9886, 9384, 6398, 6399, 6401, 265, 320, 9201, 9204, 9368, 9255, 9263, 9429, 9046, 2980, 9632, 9644, 9668, 9757, 9790, 7348, 9524, 9527; a total of 37, or 3 per cent. of the total stock | SLS/194701 |
15/07/1950 | Derby Works | 42146 almost complete; UTA.56 complete and painted; UTA.57 nearly complete. First two sets of frames in position for order No. 4310. Nos. 404, 40411/6, 43364 in store near station, joined a fortnight later by 43342 an 43482. Fresh off Works: 47000, 2035, 43900/61 repainted with emblem; 42503, 43985, 44007, 44200, 47233, 58075, 58234 lettered L.M.S.; 40656, 40925, 41064/96, 42377/93 lined black, with emblem; 40671 'British Railways'; 42311 unlined. In Paint Shop 58054 (ex 1341) with emblem. For shops W/E 15/7/50: 434, 40535, 41051, 41168, 1889, 42351/3, 42406, 3101, 43690, 43892/98, 44112/72, 7342, 58224, 64722, 64951, 4969. Still in Works Yard at end of July: 22853, 3511, 41034, 43297, 43818, 58036, 58229 (condemned). 24/7/50: Ex Works: 2070 still lettered G.W.R. 64827 repainted with emblem; 64903, tender lettered L.N.E.R.; 42503 lettered L.M.S. 30/7/50: 42146, UTA.56/57, Order 4310 as on 13th. Nos. 12070/1 complete, 12072/3 almost complete; 10800 in Diesel shop; 41060 lined with 'British Railways' on tender; 41181 has tender unlined with emblem; 42340 lined black with emblem. | SLS/195010 |
15/09/1950 | Derby Works | For works during first half of September: 40653 4B, 41050/9 14B, 41065 23C, 41118 8E, 42325 14B, 42533 33A, 43754 22B, 43959 18C, 43968 and M4010 21A, 44164 an 44402 17A, 44174 17D, 7588 5C, 7635 22B, 58137 16C, 64883 40A, 40410 35C, 41062 19B, 41068 20A, 1251 (58034) 22B, 42339 16A, 42344 5D, 42345 5C, 43246 an 43435 21A, 43344 22B, 3650 18A, 43819 18A, 43925 20D, 44180 17C, 44355 22A, 7481 87K, 22945 (58136) 20B, 58237 20C, 64757 38A, 64959 32A, 40001 11A, 40351 20A, 426 17A, 41001 22B, 41004 20E, 41006 15C, 41067 20E, 41095 15C, 41154 9E, 1429 (58090) 20C, 42364 5D, 42509 33C, 42512 33C, 3456 20A, 3914 18D, 44598 16A, 47548 19A, 58209 19B, 64798 38E. New Construction: No. 42050 was ex Paint Shop on 6/9, and others up to 42057 were in various stages in the Erecting Shop. Diesels 12074/5 were completed and others up to 12079 in course of construction. No. 42146 was on trials on 6/9. Nos. 404, 40411/6 have gone into traffic ex store, but Nos. 407, 40513, 43342/64, 43482 are in store, near the station. Withdrawn: still in works Yard: 40498, 40515, 41017, 43297, 43818, 22853 (58112), 3511 (58275), 1251 (58034) and 1406 (58079). No. 41748 is ex Works, with round-top firebox. No. 58080 (0-4-4T) has appeared fully lined, with emblem. Among those repainted black with emblem are 2108 (0-6-OPT), and J.39 Nos. 64762/5/84/97, 64903/62/9, while 64906/51 still retain BRITISH RAILWAYS (not repainted). |
SLS/195012 |
23/09/1950 | Derby Works | For Works: W/E 23/9/50:-40497 35C, 40532 35C, 41153 6A, 42381 9A, 43259 17A, 3321 21A, 43789 20C, 44235 71G, 44565 17D, 46404 15B, 7509 25E, 22975 (58154) 20E, 58091 15D (W)2060 82C. Ex Works: 2108, 40527, 41118, 43854, 43929/59/68, 44010, 44402, 47451, 47588, 64906/69. Withdrawn engines: Nos. 1251, 1406, 3511, 40515, 40498, 41017, 43818, 22853 an 58236 were still in the yard on 29/9, but since that date several have been fitted with tenders for supplying steam at carriage sidings, including 3511, 40515, 41017, 43297 and possibly 43818. The other four still in the yard have been joined by 58059 (9/10). |
SLS/195012 |
10/03/1963 | Ardsley MPD (Stored) | Stored at Ardsley on 10th March-60036/69/70/7/80/92/125, 61068/310, 64719/49/54/6/60/96/859/79/86/911/8/69, 67742/63/5/6/77. | SLS/196304 |
01/04/1963 | Washingborough Junction (Stored) | The Washingborough Junc.- Pelham St. Junc, section of the Boston-Lincoln line has been taken out of use; trains now use the former avoiding line from Washingborough Junc. (s.b. now closed) to Greetwell Junc. and the GN/GE Joint line thence to Lincoln Central. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/08/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1996 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1768 Allocated to March (MAR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
08/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1940. Dep: 11/05/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4906 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/04/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
12/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1942. Dep: 20/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4915 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/03/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
30/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1944. Dep: 14/10/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3195 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/04/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
02/08/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
31/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
05/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1946. Dep: 08/02/1947. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4969 |
||
22/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
28/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
11/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1950. Dep: 20/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number E1356 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64969 |
||
03/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
02/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1953. Dep: 13/06/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27762 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/06/1953. Dep: 08/07/1953. | ||
16/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1956. Dep: 23/06/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27729 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1959. Dep: 30/07/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27799 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/08/1959. Dep: 26/08/1959. | ||
16/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
17/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
30/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64969 from Ardsley (56B) | ||
09/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |