|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 22/08/1941 | 21/11/1941 | 92 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/10/1943 | 18/12/1943 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 2093 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/11/1946 | 22/05/1947 | 187 days | General | Boiler number 2146 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/09/1949 | 26/11/1949 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 2772 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64966 |
||
Gorton Works | 22/09/1953 | 24/10/1953 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 25802 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/10/1953 | 30/10/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 01/12/1956 | 12/01/1957 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 27761 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/01/1957 | 20/02/1957 | 34 days | Unclassified | Not repaired |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/07/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1977 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1764 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
22/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1941. Dep: 21/11/1941. | ||
19/10/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
21/08/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
14/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1943. Dep: 18/12/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2093 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4966 | ||
17/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1946. Dep: 22/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2146 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1949. Dep: 26/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2772 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64966 |
||
20/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) | ||
11/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
01/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) | ||
16/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
22/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
22/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1953. Dep: 24/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 25802 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/10/1953. Dep: 30/10/1953. | ||
18/12/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
01/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1956. Dep: 12/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27761 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/01/1957. Dep: 20/02/1957. Work undertaken: Not repaired |
||
04/01/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
07/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
11/07/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64966 from Lincoln (40A) |