|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 08/10/1940 | 30/11/1940 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 4913 (Diagram 97) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/08/1941 | 22/11/1941 | 99 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 14/05/1943 | 24/07/1943 | 72 days | General | Boiler number 4906 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/01/1947 | 27/08/1947 | 225 days | General | Boiler number 3197 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/05/1949 | 09/06/1949 | 30 days | Heavy Casual | Renumbered to BR 64965 |
||
Gorton Works | 29/01/1950 | 18/03/1950 | 49 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 22/03/1950 | 24/03/1950 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 22/02/1951 | 12/04/1951 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 27802 (Diagram 97) |
||
Derby Works | 18/12/1951 | 01/02/1952 | 46 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 12/10/1953 | 07/11/1953 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 27660 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/03/1956 | 19/05/1956 | 74 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 12/05/1958 | 20/06/1958 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27847 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 18/08/1958 | 20/08/1958 | 3 days | Light Casual | Spark arrestor & continuous blow-down fitted |
||
Stratford Works | 30/12/1958 | 31/12/1958 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 31/12/1958 | 06/01/1959 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Bow Works | 21/01/1959 | 27/01/1959 | 7 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1951 | Derby Works | During February, un-renumbered engines in Works were 7665 (5C), 7453 (10E), 762 (15D), 4409 (17A), 7125 (18A), 3334 (19A), 3449 (20B), 3656 (20D), 3257, 4203/24 (21A), 7567 (25G). Engines received from other regions for attention were (30A) 64781, (32A) 64731, (32B) 64900, (33C) 42505/11, (35C) 44476, (37A) 64760, 64840, (E) 4907, (38A) 64716, 64965, (40A) 64725, 64886, (71G) 44560, (71H) 43194, (84J) 2183, (85B) 2144, (86B) 2033. Engines despatched to other regions after repair include (30A) 64783, (32A) 64802, (32B) 64905, (33A) 42328, (33C) 42506, (35C) 40482, 44518, (36A) 64910/67, (37A) 64751, 64836, 64911, (38A) 64832, (40A) 64730, (71G) 44560, (84G) 43679, (87K) 42385. No. 58246 (LMS.3175) has come off works still with round-topped fire-box. The following withdrawn engines were cut up in February: 22853, 41012, 41962, 762, 41824, 43811; while Nos. 41011, 41955/60/3-5/8 and Crane 58865 were in the yard. Stored, near station: 40411/6, 40632, 41000/60, 43200/59, 43361/70, 43429. No. 43226 is in for special examination, and may be condemned. At the end of the month, Nos. 407, 40418 an 40513, which have been in store for some time near the station, were returned to traffic. |
SLS/195104 |
31/12/1958 | Stratford Works (Old Works) | Old Works-61003 (30F), 43107 (31D), 61066 (31A), 61089 (30A), 61136 (14D), 61160 (32B), 61164 (30A), 61254 (32B), 61299 (40E), 61361 (30E), 61372 (30A), 61632 (31A), 64677 (30A), 64965 (33A), 65561 (32B), 69695-Wdn., 80079 (33B). Diesel Shop-12064 (14A), 15214 (75C), D208 (34B), D2208 (30A), D2210 (32A), D2214 (32A), D3221 (75C), D3444 (34A), D3460 (73C), D3476 (34C), D5514 (30A), D8407 (30A). Waiting Wks.-61336 (30E), 61573 (31E), 61576 (31E), 62571 (40A), 62582 (31A), 62610 (31C), 64651 (30E), 64672 (31B), 64688 (31A), 68625 (32D), 68630 (30A), 68636 (30A), 69610 (30A), 69616 (31A), 69703 (30A), 69717 (30A), Departmental 36. Stripping-62614, 69608/41. Foundry-65568, 65587, 69624. On Shed Ex Wks.-D2573 (32G), D3217 (75A). Waiting Cut Up-61547/61/4, 62518/34/6/43/5/66/72/88/615, 62788, 64645, 65390/438/41/4, 65504/74, 68529/41/616/8/32, 68653/7/9/62/6, 69628. | SLS/195902 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/07/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1974 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1763 Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
23/06/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
04/09/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
13/10/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
08/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1940. Dep: 30/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4913 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/08/1941. Dep: 22/11/1941. | ||
30/04/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
14/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1943. Dep: 24/07/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4906 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4965 | ||
15/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1947. Dep: 27/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3197 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/02/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
11/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 11/05/1949. Dep: 09/06/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64965 |
||
29/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/01/1950. Dep: 18/03/1950. | ||
22/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/03/1950. Dep: 24/03/1950. | ||
26/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
22/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1951. Dep: 12/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27802 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/12/1951. Dep: 01/02/1952. | ||
12/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) | ||
12/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1953. Dep: 07/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27660 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1956. Dep: 19/05/1956. | ||
12/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1958. Dep: 20/06/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27847 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Plaistow (33A) | ||
18/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/08/1958. Dep: 20/08/1958. Work undertaken: Spark arrestor & continuous blow-down fitted |
||
30/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/12/1958. Dep: 31/12/1958. | ||
31/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/12/1958. Dep: 06/01/1959. | ||
21/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Bow Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/01/1959. Dep: 27/01/1959. | ||
31/10/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tilbury (33B) | ||
03/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
14/03/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64965 from Tilbury (33B) |