|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 24/08/1940 | 12/10/1940 | 50 days | General | Boiler number E1355 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 07/03/1943 | 26/06/1943 | 112 days | General | Boiler number 2102 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 08/09/1945 | 26/10/1945 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 2205 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 29/09/1946 | 12/11/1946 | 45 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 10/04/1947 | 19/05/1947 | 40 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 15/02/1948 | 15/04/1948 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 4934 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64958 |
||
Derby Works | 06/10/1950 | 01/12/1950 | 57 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Derby Works | 21/04/1952 | 04/06/1952 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 27433 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 11/02/1955 | 26/03/1955 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27678 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 29/10/1957 | 30/11/1957 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 25827 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 11/08/1958 | 14/08/1958 | 4 days | Light Casual | Continuous blow-down fitted |
||
Bow Works | 16/12/1958 | 19/12/1958 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 10/08/1959 | 19/08/1959 | 10 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
21/10/1950 | Derby Works | For Works: W/E 21/10/50, 40405 5C, 40505 71H, 40522 8E, 40743 20A, 41123 7A, 42184 16A, 42332 9B, 42374 33A, 42521 33D, 43212 18C, 44166 17B, 4267 22A, 44524 21A, 7096 1A, 7441 15C, 47469 23C, 20155 16A, 23006 3E, 58247 17C, (W) 2107 84F, 64834 32B, 64958 30A. The most interesting items are 40743 for intermediate repair, and 20155 (the last 2-4-0-Midland-for special examination which usually means condemnation). New construction: 42054 on trials 18/10, 42055/6 completed, 42057-60 in various stages; 12078 in paint shop 18/10, 12079-81 complete, 12082-4 in various stages. Ex works 40532/655, 41004/67, 42509/22, 42325, 47410, 64721/37/57, 64956/80 (W/E 18/10), 40584, 41001/60, 41153/65/81, 41833, 42345, 43586, 43992, 47340, 47674, 64883 (W/E 25/10). Cut up: 15-18/10/50. Nos. 1251 an 1406 (old Nos.). No. 58236, in paint shop 18/10 with R/T boiler. Stored: 407, 40418/513/556/632, 43342/64, 3368, 43482, 43200. (25/10). |
SLS/195012 |
30/11/1950 | Derby Works | In addition to the normal types of L.M.S. origin, the following have come off works: 2060, 2107, 12011, 64749/82, 64807/34, 64958/9. Withdrawn engines in works yard: 3802, 20155, 22853, 58061. No. 20155 has had the number freshly painted on the smokebox door, and neatly enclosed in a white-painted rectangle. Buffer beam repainted, but boiler casing removed. Engines in for repair 2053 (82D), 12012 (8C), 12002 (5B), 64841 (32B), 64893 (36A), 64971 (40A), 64727 (9F), (6)4910 (36A), 64734 (40A), 64793 (32B), 64805 (39A), 42387/8 (87K); 7316 (71G); and the following other un-renumbered engines 7583 (26B), 2995 (18B), 524 (7B), 4294 (18A), 7131 (21A), 7298 (4A), 7300 (33A), 32 (14B); also numerous others of L.M.S. origin. Position as regards new construction on 30/11/50:-42062/3 almost complete; 42064/5 commenced; 12084/5 in paint shop, 12086 completed. Early in December another diesel, 12087 had the engines mounted, and the frames of 73000 were in the erecting shop. Among engines entering works were 509 (71G), 2988 (15B), 3827 (18A), 7503 (11C), 64802 (32A), 64979 (37A). Nos. 509, 43319 an 3827 were 'for special examination' and may not survive the ordeal. |
SLS/195101 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
31/05/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1933 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1755 Allocated to Stratford (STR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
24/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1940. Dep: 12/10/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number E1355 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/12/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
07/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1943. Dep: 26/06/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2102 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1945. Dep: 26/10/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2205 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4958 | ||
29/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/09/1946. Dep: 12/11/1946. | ||
10/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/04/1947. Dep: 19/05/1947. | ||
15/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1948. Dep: 15/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4934 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64958 |
||
06/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 06/10/1950. Dep: 01/12/1950. | ||
14/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
20/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
21/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1952. Dep: 04/06/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27433 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1955. Dep: 26/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27678 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/09/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
29/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1957. Dep: 30/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 25827 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Plaistow (33A) | ||
11/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/08/1958. Dep: 14/08/1958. Work undertaken: Continuous blow-down fitted |
||
16/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Bow Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/12/1958. Dep: 19/12/1958. | ||
10/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/08/1959. Dep: 19/08/1959. | ||
31/10/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tilbury (33B) | ||
03/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
14/03/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64958 from Tilbury (33B) |