|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 27/02/1940 | 27/03/1940 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2723 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/10/1942 | 03/11/1942 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2715 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 22/02/1945 | 17/03/1945 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 2708 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/09/1947 | 06/12/1947 | 74 days | General | Boiler number 4930 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 09/11/1949 | 10/12/1949 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 27548 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64941 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/05/1953 | 14/06/1953 | 26 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/01/1955 | 12/02/1955 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2622 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 14/03/1955 | 18/03/1955 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 25/09/1958 | 25/10/1958 | 31 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/10/1959 | 05/12/1959 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2623 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 60501/05, 61002, 1293, 61701/49/86/88, 61857, 61909, 2422, 62426, 62706, 3049, 3126, 4548/90, 4615/16, 4706, 64794, 4842, 4923/41, 5902, 65907, 5909/12/26, 7477, 67608, 8121, 8445, 8503, 8952, 9143/76/88, 69199, 9205, 90004, 73798, 77342/71. | SLS/195001 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/03/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1548 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1734 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
27/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1940. Dep: 27/03/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2723 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1942. Dep: 03/11/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2715 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
14/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
22/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1945. Dep: 17/03/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2708 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4941 | ||
24/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1947. Dep: 06/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4930 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
15/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
09/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1949. Dep: 10/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27548 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64941 |
||
20/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
26/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
04/01/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
20/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/05/1953. Dep: 14/06/1953. | ||
12/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1955. Dep: 12/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2622 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/03/1955. Dep: 18/03/1955. | ||
25/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 25/09/1958. Dep: 25/10/1958. | ||
28/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1959. Dep: 05/12/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2623 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64941 from Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
04/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |