|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 14/06/1939 | 04/08/1939 | 52 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 26/01/1942 | 04/03/1942 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27772 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/05/1943 | 07/06/1943 | 34 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/09/1943 | 16/10/1943 | 46 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 17/12/1945 | 02/03/1946 | 76 days | General | Boiler number 4907 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/02/1948 | 02/04/1948 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 2698 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64937 |
||
Derby Works | 10/02/1951 | 03/04/1951 | 53 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Stratford Works | 18/07/1953 | 22/08/1953 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 27788 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/09/1956 | 27/10/1956 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 27778 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/10/1956 | 01/11/1956 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 25/02/1959 | 05/03/1959 | 9 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
18/02/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1538 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1730 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
14/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1939. Dep: 04/08/1939. | ||
26/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1942. Dep: 04/03/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27772 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
05/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/05/1943. Dep: 07/06/1943. | ||
01/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1943. Dep: 16/10/1943. | ||
15/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
17/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1945. Dep: 02/03/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4907 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4937 | ||
22/12/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
27/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
22/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1948. Dep: 02/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2698 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64937 |
||
10/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 10/02/1951. Dep: 03/04/1951. | ||
18/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1953. Dep: 22/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27788 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1956. Dep: 27/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27778 (Diagram 97) |
||
31/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/10/1956. Dep: 01/11/1956. | ||
25/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/02/1959. Dep: 05/03/1959. | ||
15/02/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64937 from Lincoln (40A) | ||
03/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |