|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 19/08/1938 | 01/09/1938 | 14 days | Unclassified | Welded boiler exam |
||
Darlington Works | 14/03/1940 | 12/04/1940 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2913 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/04/1940 | 20/04/1940 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1941 | 11/06/1941 | 23 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/09/1942 | 15/10/1942 | 27 days | General | Boiler number BP145 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/04/1943 | 03/05/1943 | 28 days | Heavy | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/01/1944 | 12/02/1944 | 43 days | General | Boiler number BP131 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 12/05/1945 | 26/05/1945 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/06/1946 | 06/07/1946 | 29 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/05/1948 | 19/06/1948 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27469 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64935 |
||
Inverurie Works | 27/09/1951 | 02/11/1951 | 37 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 31/10/1952 | 28/11/1952 | 29 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/08/1953 | 14/09/1953 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 27527 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/05/1956 | 23/06/1956 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 10/03/1958 | 17/03/1958 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 31/08/1960 | 22/10/1960 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 27667 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/02/1962 | 02/03/1962 | 16 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/04/1954 | Wetherby Races, Easter Monday | Excursion trains between Leeds City and Wetherby Racecourse station on Easter Monday were well filled and worked by the following J39's from Neville Hill (50B):-64791, 64819/35/86, 64920/22/33/35/43, and also brought in D49 62748 (50B). The excursions from Bradford and Harrogate brought in 62746/58/62 (all 50D), whilst two trains from the Huddersfield area were worked by 45218 (25A) and 42863 (25B). The excursion from Heeley (Sheffield) was, however, worked by 45015 (3B-Bushbury), rather a far cry from Wolverhampton. In addition, the 4.28 p.m. ordinary passenger service from Leeds City to Church Fenton via Wetherby, hauled by 61256 (50B), called specially at Wetherby Racecourse station to pick up. | SLS/195406 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/02/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1535 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1728 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
19/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/08/1938. Dep: 01/09/1938. Work undertaken: Welded boiler exam |
||
29/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
14/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1940. Dep: 12/04/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2913 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/04/1940. Dep: 20/04/1940. | ||
20/07/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
20/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/05/1941. Dep: 11/06/1941. | ||
19/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1942. Dep: 15/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number BP145 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 06/04/1943. Dep: 03/05/1943. | ||
01/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1944. Dep: 12/02/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number BP131 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/05/1945. Dep: 26/05/1945. | ||
02/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4935 | ||
08/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1946. Dep: 06/07/1946. | ||
11/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1948. Dep: 19/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27469 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64935 |
||
25/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA) | ||
01/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA) | ||
07/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
27/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/09/1951. Dep: 02/11/1951. | ||
31/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 31/10/1952. Dep: 28/11/1952. | ||
14/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1953. Dep: 14/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27527 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/05/1956. Dep: 23/06/1956. | ||
10/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/03/1958. Dep: 17/03/1958. | ||
31/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1960. Dep: 22/10/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27667 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/02/1962. Dep: 02/03/1962. | ||
17/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64935 from Neville Hill (55H) | ||
04/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |