|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 27/07/1938 | 05/08/1938 | 10 days | Unclassified | Welded boiler exam |
||
Darlington Works | 14/06/1940 | 11/07/1940 | 28 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/07/1942 | 18/08/1942 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 1902 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 26/01/1945 | 03/03/1945 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 2100 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 02/11/1946 | 07/12/1946 | 36 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/12/1947 | 21/02/1948 | 68 days | General | Boiler number 2714 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gateshead Works | 20/06/1949 | 30/06/1949 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/06/1951 | 10/07/1951 | 27 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64934 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 07/07/1953 | 05/09/1953 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 27482 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 11/10/1956 | 17/11/1956 | 38 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/07/1960 | 27/08/1960 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 27727 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 14/09/1960 | 1 day | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
25/01/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1509 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1724 Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
27/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/07/1938. Dep: 05/08/1938. Work undertaken: Welded boiler exam |
||
14/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1940. Dep: 11/07/1940. | ||
06/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1942. Dep: 18/08/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1902 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
19/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
26/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1945. Dep: 03/03/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2100 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4934 | ||
02/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/11/1946. Dep: 07/12/1946. | ||
16/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1947. Dep: 21/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2714 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
13/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
20/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/06/1949. Dep: 30/06/1949. | ||
12/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
18/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
14/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/06/1951. Dep: 10/07/1951. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64934 |
||
07/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1953. Dep: 05/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27482 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 11/10/1956. Dep: 17/11/1956. | ||
22/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1960. Dep: 27/08/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27727 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/09/1960. | ||
17/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64934 from Neville Hill (55H) | ||
04/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |