|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 21/02/1940 | 16/03/1940 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 2936 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/03/1942 | 29/04/1942 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2917 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 17/06/1944 | 08/07/1944 | 22 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/05/1947 | 16/08/1947 | 85 days | Heavy | Boiler number RS119 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/09/1947 | 1 day | W | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 01/07/1950 | 12/08/1950 | 43 days | Light Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64933 |
||
Gorton Works | 31/03/1953 | 27/08/1953 | 150 days | General | Boiler number 27769 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 16/08/1956 | 15/09/1956 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/09/1960 | 15/10/1960 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 27546 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
24/08/1947 | Eastfield MPD | On 24/8 the locos. on shed ex works were 'J39' 4923/33; 'J83' 8445 and 'J69' 8623, and further locos. ex works during August that have been noted here are: 'K2' 1757; 'J37' 4541/79/84, 4604/17/21; 'J39' 4711, 4818, 4929; 'C15' 7468; 'J88' 8345; 'J83' 8473 (green); 'N15' 9136/77 an 9222. | SLS/194710 |
30/06/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Engines into shops: 1131, 1752, 3115, 4596, 4846, 4933, 5922, 5927, 7473, 8442, 8460, 8463, 8468, 8474, 8475, 8479, 9171, 61146, 61180, 61879, 61911, 62478, 62496, 62688, 63038, 63151, 64539, 64566, 64573, 64607, 64626, 64632, 64821, 64925, 64964, 67617, 68957, 69214, 69565, 77375, 77456, 90496. | SLS/195008 |
19/04/1954 | Wetherby Races, Easter Monday | Excursion trains between Leeds City and Wetherby Racecourse station on Easter Monday were well filled and worked by the following J39's from Neville Hill (50B):-64791, 64819/35/86, 64920/22/33/35/43, and also brought in D49 62748 (50B). The excursions from Bradford and Harrogate brought in 62746/58/62 (all 50D), whilst two trains from the Huddersfield area were worked by 45218 (25A) and 42863 (25B). The excursion from Heeley (Sheffield) was, however, worked by 45015 (3B-Bushbury), rather a far cry from Wolverhampton. In addition, the 4.28 p.m. ordinary passenger service from Leeds City to Church Fenton via Wetherby, hauled by 61256 (50B), called specially at Wetherby Racecourse station to pick up. | SLS/195406 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/12/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1508 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1723 Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
21/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1940. Dep: 16/03/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2936 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1942. Dep: 29/04/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2917 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
21/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
08/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
17/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1944. Dep: 08/07/1944. | ||
23/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
11/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4933 | ||
24/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 24/05/1947. Dep: 16/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number RS119 (Diagram 97) |
||
20/09/1947 | Works Visit | |||
01/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 01/07/1950. Dep: 12/08/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64933 |
||
10/09/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
31/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1953. Dep: 27/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27769 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/08/1956. Dep: 15/09/1956. | ||
09/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1960. Dep: 15/10/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27546 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64933 from Neville Hill (55H) | ||
06/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |