|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 16/09/1937 | 18/09/1937 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/05/1938 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 30/03/1939 | 1 day | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 24/05/1941 | 1 day | General | Boiler number 27531 (Diagram 97) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 02/09/1944 | 1 day | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 15/09/1947 | 15/11/1947 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 2939 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 03/11/1950 | 01/12/1950 | 29 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/03/1953 | 05/04/1953 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 27504 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/12/1954 | 26/01/1955 | 34 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/02/1955 | 03/02/1955 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/02/1955 | 17/02/1955 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/04/1957 | 25/05/1957 | 40 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Stratford Works | 15/09/1957 | 17/09/1957 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/02/1959 | 20/03/1959 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 27358 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1947 | Eastfield MPD | Further locos. ex Cowlairs Works that have been noted here during November were: Nos. 1728/45, 1764/6 (green, with 1766 snowplough fitted), 2406/31/64/75, 4574, 4605/39, 4817, 4932, 5924, 7465, 8096, 8471, 8957, 9144/62/73. | SLS/194801 |
30/08/1961 | Cowlairs Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D2708/70/4, 44783, 45213, 45361, 61324/46/96, 65919, 80030, 90017, 90386, 90463, 90614. Valve Shop: 73077. Stripping Shop: 65923. Weigh House: 64847. Paint Shop: 73099. Works Yard: D2434, D2726, D3393, 44485, 61178, 64932, 72009, 73005, 80045, 90753. Scrap Yard: 64710 intact, 64700 being out-up. Works Shunters: D2760, D3418. | SLS/196110 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/05/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1894 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6829 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
21/06/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) | ||
16/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/09/1937. Dep: 18/09/1937. | ||
21/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/05/1938. | ||
30/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1939. | ||
24/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27531 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1944. | ||
07/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4932 | ||
15/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1947. Dep: 15/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2939 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/09/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 64932 | ||
03/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1950. Dep: 01/12/1950. | ||
11/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1953. Dep: 05/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27504 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/12/1954. Dep: 26/01/1955. | ||
01/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/02/1955. Dep: 03/02/1955. | ||
09/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/02/1955. Dep: 17/02/1955. | ||
16/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/04/1957. Dep: 25/05/1957. | ||
15/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/09/1957. Dep: 17/09/1957. | ||
16/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1959. Dep: 20/03/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27358 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/07/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64932 from Carlisle Canal (12C) | ||
08/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped |