|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 23/10/1937 | 25/10/1937 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 31/12/1938 | 1 day | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 04/10/1941 | 15/11/1941 | 43 days | General | Boiler number C1716 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 15/12/1944 | 1 day | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 11/08/1945 | 25/08/1945 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/10/1947 | 19/12/1947 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 27535 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 19/09/1948 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 30/05/1951 | 18/06/1951 | 20 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/03/1954 | 24/04/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 27506 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 12/10/1956 | 03/11/1956 | 23 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/02/1958 | 29/03/1958 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 27561 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/05/1959 | 25/05/1959 | 5 days | W | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/09/1959 | 01/10/1959 | 25 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/05/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1875 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6827 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
28/05/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) | ||
23/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/10/1937. Dep: 25/10/1937. | ||
31/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1938. | ||
04/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1941. Dep: 15/11/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1716 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1944. | ||
11/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/08/1945. Dep: 25/08/1945. | ||
07/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4930 | ||
16/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1947. Dep: 19/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27535 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/09/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 64930 | ||
19/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/09/1948. | ||
30/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 30/05/1951. Dep: 18/06/1951. | ||
24/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1954. Dep: 24/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27506 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 12/10/1956. Dep: 03/11/1956. | ||
24/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1958. Dep: 29/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27561 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/11/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (9G) | ||
21/05/1959 | Works Visit | |||
07/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/09/1959. Dep: 01/10/1959. | ||
03/07/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64930 from Gorton (9G) | ||
08/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped |